US HB5202 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Patient Access to Substance Use Disorder Treatments Act of 2018 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to allow a pharmacy to deliver a controlled substance to a practitioner, in accordance with a prescription, to be administered to a specific patient for maintenance or detoxification treatment or through an intrathecal pump. The bill directs the Government Accountability Office to report to Congress on access to and the potential diversion of controlled substances administered by injection, implantation, or through the use of an intrathecal pump.
Title
Ensuring Patient Access to Substance Use Disorder Treatments Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Held at the desk.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Crime and law enforcement
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5202/BILLS-115hr5202ih.pdf |