US HB5179 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the maintenance of the country of origin markings for imported goods produced in the West Bank or Gaza, and for other purposes.
Title
Anti-BDS Labeling Act
Sponsors
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2024-09-18 - House - On Passage RC# 428 (Y: 231 N: 189 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-09-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 189 (Roll no. 428). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5350) |
2024-09-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5372) |
2024-09-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5179, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Kildee demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-09-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-09-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5179. |
2024-09-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3724, H.R. 4790, H.R. 5179, H.R. 5339, H.R. 5717, H.R. 7909 and H.J. Res. 136. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3724 and H.R. 5717 under a structured rule and H.R. 4790, H.R. 5179, H.R. 5339, H.R. 7909, and H.J. Res. 136 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each measure. |
2024-09-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1455. (consideration: CR H5350-5353) |
2024-09-17 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1455 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3724, H.R. 4790, H.R. 5179, H.R. 5339, H.R. 5717, H.R. 7909 and H.J. Res. 136. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3724 and H.R. 5717 under a structured rule and H.R. 4790, H.R. 5179, H.R. 5339, H.R. 7909, and H.J. Res. 136 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each measure. |
2024-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557. |
2024-09-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-661. |
2024-04-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17. |
2024-04-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-08-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-08-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1455 (Related) 2024-09-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.