US HB5163 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate support and services to women who find themselves with an unexpected pregnancy, to meet the emotional, physical, social, financial, and other needs women encounter during pregnancy, childbirth, and child-rearing, and for other purposes.
Title
Care for Her Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] |
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2021-09-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5163/BILLS-117hr5163ih.pdf |