US HB5150 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000, and for other purposes.
Title
Frederick Douglass Trafficking Victims Prevention and Protection Reauthorization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-09-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2858 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6552 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9217 (Related) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB6552 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9217 (Related) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5150/BILLS-117hr5150ih.pdf |