US HB2858 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the court to depart from a statutory minimum in the case of a juvenile offender, youthful victim offender, and certain other minors, and for other purposes.
Title
Sara’s Law and the Preventing Unfair Sentencing Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5150 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3946 (Related) 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-347.
SB3946 (Related) 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-347.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2858/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2858/BILLS-117hr2858ih.pdf |