US HB5133 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-359.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-359.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 331 1st Street in Carlstadt, New Jersey, as the "Staff Sergeant Frank T. Carvill and Lance Corporal Michael A. Schwarz Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 331 1st Street in Carlstadt, New Jersey, as the "Staff Sergeant Frank T. Carvill and Lance Corporal Michael A. Schwarz Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. John Adler [D-NJ] | Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] |
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | Became Public Law No: 111-359. | |
2011-01-04 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-28 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-17 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-16 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-16 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10365) | |
2010-12-16 | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-06-30 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-06-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-06-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 346). (text: CR H4267) | |
2010-06-09 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4299) | |
2010-06-09 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Chu objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-06-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5133. | |
2010-06-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4267-4269) | |
2010-06-09 | Ms. Chu moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-05-06 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-05-06 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New Jersey
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New Jersey
Postal service