US HB5123 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-298.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-298.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 476 East Main Street in Galesburg, Illinois, as the "Senior Airman Daniel Miller Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 476 East Main Street in Galesburg, Illinois, as the "Senior Airman Daniel Miller Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-298. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643-7644) |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7135) |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7135) |
2020-12-10 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-12-10 | House | Ms. Kelly (IL) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service