US HB511 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tribal Labor Sovereignty Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the National Labor Relations Act to provide that any Indian tribe or any enterprise or institution owned and operated by an Indian tribe and located on its lands is not considered an employer (thus excluding Indian tribes and such enterprises or institutions from coverage by the Act).
Title
Tribal Labor Sovereignty Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 249 N: 177 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-17 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 177 (Roll no. 633). (text: CR H8260-8261) |
2015-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8272) |
2015-11-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 8 of rule 20, the Speaker postponed further proceedings on H.R. 511. |
2015-11-17 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H8271) |
2015-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 511. |
2015-11-17 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1737 and H.R. 511. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. For the purposes of requesting a conference with the Senate, the resolution provides that the House has taken S. 1177 from the Speaker's table, adopts an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of H.R. 5, as passed by the House and adopts S. 1177, as amended. The resolution makes in order only those amendments to H.R. 1737 printed in the report. H.R. 511 shall be considered under a closed rule. |
2015-11-17 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 526. (consideration: CR H8260-8271) |
2015-11-17 | House | Rule H. Res. 526 passed House. |
2015-11-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 526 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1737 and H.R. 511. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. For the purposes of requesting a conference with the Senate, the resolution provides that the House has taken S. 1177 from the Speaker's table, adopts an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of H.R. 5, as passed by the House and adopts S. 1177, as amendend. The resolution makes in order only those amendments to H.R. 1737 printed inthe report. H.R. 511 shall be considered under a closed rule. |
2015-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 197. |
2015-09-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-260. |
2015-07-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-07-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB248 (Same As) 2015-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
HR526 (Related) 2015-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR526 (Related) 2015-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.