US HB5099 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CHIP IN for Vets Act of 2016 Communities Helping Invest through Property and Improvements Needed for Veterans Act of 2016 This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a program under which it may enter into up to five partnership arrangements with a non-federal entity to conduct one or more: super construction projects (those for the construction, alteration, or acquisition of a medical facility involving a total expenditure of more than $100 million); major construction projects (those for the construction, alteration, or acquisition of a medical facility involving a total expenditure of more than $10 million, but not including an acquisition by exchange); or major construction projects to construct a new cemetery or to develop additional gravesites or columbarium niches at an existing cemetery. The selected projects may be ones for which: Congress has appropriated partial funding or the VA has identified a need for the project by listing it on the Major Construction Strategic Capital Investment Planning priority list, and a non-federal entity has entered or is willing to enter into a formal agreement with the VA to independently finance and/or donate acceptable project funds at no additional government cost. One of the non-federal entity partnership agreements shall be a project to design, finance, and construct a new ambulatory care center in Omaha, Nebraska.
Title
CHIP IN for Vets Act of 2016 Communities Helping Invest through Property and Improvements Needed for Veterans Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-294. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7128-7131) |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7303-7304) |
2016-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5099. |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7303-7304) |
2016-12-07 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 638. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-814. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Nebraska
Veterans' medical care
Building construction
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Nebraska
Veterans' medical care