US HB5048 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 131-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect our democracy by preventing abuses of Presidential power, restoring checks and balances and accountability and transparency in government, and defending elections against foreign interference, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Our Democracy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB908 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2599 (Related) 2023-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3044 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4434 (Related) 2023-06-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB486 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1596 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1912 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1002 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB1652 (Related) 2023-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB3229 (Related) 2023-11-30 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB3463 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1638 (Related) 2023-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2599 (Related) 2023-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3044 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4434 (Related) 2023-06-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB486 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1596 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1912 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1002 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB1652 (Related) 2023-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB3229 (Related) 2023-11-30 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB3463 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1638 (Related) 2023-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5048/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5048/BILLS-118hr5048ih.pdf |