US HB502 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to report on the use of virtual currencies and online marketplaces in sex and drug trafficking. The GAO must study topics including how illicit proceeds are transferred into the U.S. banking system, state and non-state actors that participate in such activity, preventative efforts from federal and state agencies, and the extent to which the unique characteristics of virtual currencies can contribute to the tracking and prosecution of illicit funding.
Title
FIND Trafficking Act Fight Illicit Networks and Detect Trafficking Act
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 53 (Y: 412 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 3 (Roll no. 53). (text: CR H1223-1224) |
2019-01-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1232-1233) |
2019-01-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 502. |
2019-01-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1223-1227) |
2019-01-28 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB410 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2563 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2563 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Currency
Digital media
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Sex offenses
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Currency
Digital media
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Sex offenses