US HB5009 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize wildlife habitat and conservation programs, and for other purposes.
Title
WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6380-6381) |
2024-09-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.3294 Amendment SA 3294 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S6380-6381) |
2024-09-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.3294 Amendment SA 3294 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-09-24 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6380-6381) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 332. |
2024-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H404-405) |
2024-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5009. |
2024-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H404-406) |
2024-02-05 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-01-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299. |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-366. |
2023-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-10-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-10-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2395 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-128.