US HB4995 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior to establish Tribal Wildlife Corridors, and for other purposes.
Title
Tribal Wildlife Corridors Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-08-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-08-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2705 (Same As) 2021-08-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB2705 (Same As) 2021-08-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4995/BILLS-117hr4995ih.pdf |