US HB4923 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-18)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-159. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-18)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-159. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill declares the sense of Congress that it should consider a miscellaneous tariff bill. (Sec. 3) The U.S. International Trade Commission shall: conduct a process, meeting specified requirements, for the submission and consideration of petitions for duty suspensions and reductions; and report to Congress on the effects of duty suspensions and reductions enacted pursuant to this Act on producers, purchasers, and consumers in the United States. (Sec. 5) The bill prescribes requirements for publication by specified congressional committees of a list of limited tariff benefits contained in a miscellaneous tariff bill.
Title
American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 415 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-159. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2673) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 2 (Roll no. 166). (text: CR H2014-2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2035) |
2016-04-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4923. |
2016-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2014-2019) |
2016-04-27 | House | Mr. Brady (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399. |
2016-04-25 | House | Committee on Rules discharged. |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-519, Part I. |
2016-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB998 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2794 (Same As) 2016-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2794 (Same As) 2016-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Economic performance and conditions
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Manufacturing
Tariffs
U.S. International Trade Commission
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Economic performance and conditions
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Manufacturing
Tariffs
U.S. International Trade Commission