US HB4913 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 816 East Salisbury Parkway in Salisbury, Maryland, as the "Sgt. Maj. Wardell B. Turner Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 816 East Salisbury Parkway in Salisbury, Maryland, as the "Sgt. Maj. Wardell B. Turner Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 816 East Salisbury Parkway in Salisbury, Maryland, as the "Sgt. Maj. Wardell B. Turner Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-288. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7064) |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 598. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8246) |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8246-8247) |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-13 | House | Mr. Russell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Maryland
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Maryland
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service