US HB4906 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits health insurance plan issuers and pharmacy benefits managers (PBMs) from receiving rebates or discounts for insulin from manufacturers who certify that its current insulin list price has been reduced to an amount no greater than what the list price was for the same insulin on July 1, 2006. This restriction does not apply to discounts provided to insurance plan holders at retail sale or to flat-rate fees for service paid to PBMs. Further, insurance plans are prohibited from applying a deductible to insulin that has received such price certification. A manufacturer may certify insulin prices by submitting to the Department of Health and Human Services data about the list price of any insulin the manufacturer has produced since January 1, 2000, and by setting the current list price for an insulin product at the 2006 rate. To remain certified, a manufacturer may not increase the list price of insulin by more than the annual increase in the medical care consumer price index. A manufacturer may certify the price of an insulin product for which it did not have a list price in 2006 by reducing the list price of such insulin to the weighted average list price in 2006 of specified insulin categories. also applies to Medicare prescription drug benefits. The bill sets the rebate for insulin under Medicaid based on the average manufacturer price of insulin during the last fiscal quarter of 2019, increasing by the medical care consumer price index thereafter.
Title
Insulin Price Reduction Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2199 (Same As) 2019-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Business records
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Business records
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4906/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4906/BILLS-116hr4906ih.pdf |