US HB490 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses workforce morale at the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The bill expands the duties of the Chief Human Capital Officer to address morale, including through leader development and employee engagement, maintaining a catalogue of available employee development opportunities, and issuing a DHS-wide employee engagement action plan. DHS (1) must establish an employee engagement steering committee, and (2) may establish an annual employee award program. DHS shall report to the congressional homeland security committees regarding the impacts of the lapse in appropriations between December 22, 2018, and January 25, 2019, on (1) DHS human resources operations; (2) DHS's ability to meet hiring benchmarks; and (3) retention, attrition, and morale of DHS personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS MORALE Act Department of Homeland Security Morale, Recognition, Learning and Engagement Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-20HousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1982-1984)
2021-04-20HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 490 are considered vacated.
2021-04-19HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-04-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 490.
2021-04-19HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1896-1898; text: CR H1896-1897)
2021-04-19HouseMr. Torres (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback