US HR330 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 51) to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1573) to clarify the rights of all persons who are held or detained at a port of entry or at any detention facility overseen by U.S. Customs and Border Protection or U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1333) to transfer and limit Executive Branch authority to suspend or restrict the entry of a class of aliens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 51) to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1573) to clarify the rights of all persons who are held or detained at a port of entry or at any detention facility overseen by U.S. Customs and Border Protection or U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1333) to transfer and limit Executive Branch authority to suspend or restrict the entry of a class of aliens; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 216 N: 206 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 214 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-20HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 214 - 207 (Roll no. 124). (text: CR H1968-1969)
2021-04-20HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 206 (Roll no. 123).
2021-04-20HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1977-1979)
2021-04-20HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 330, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Reschenthaler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on ordering the previous question until a time to be announced.
2021-04-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 330.
2021-04-20HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1968-1976)
2021-04-20HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 14.
2021-04-20HouseThe previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 316 and H. Con. Res. 30 are adopted.
2021-04-20HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-22, by Mr. Raskin.

Same As/Similar To

HB51 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate.
HR330 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1333 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1573 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HCR30 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR316 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Discharged from House Calendar.
HB367 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB370 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB396 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB397 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB408 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB490 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB965 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1251 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1395 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1491 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1528 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1532 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1565 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1602 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2523 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-16. (TXT | PDF)
HR124 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback