US HB4894 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harmful Tax Prevention Act This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to allow a health insurer to reduce its 2018 annual fee by the amount of premium rebates provided to enrollees under this bill. Premium rebates must be equal to the lesser of 2% of the net premiums for each individual or the premiums paid by an individual. For a Medicaid managed care organization, the 2018 annual fee shall be reduced by 2% of the net premiums.
Title
Harmful Tax Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4620 (Related) 2017-12-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4894/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4894/BILLS-115hr4894ih.pdf |