US HB4869 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act
Title
Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2325 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Held at the desk.
HB5956 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-218.
HB5956 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-218.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4869/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4869/BILLS-115hr4869ih.pdf |