US SB2325 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act
Title
Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-04-24 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2351-2354) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.2239 Amendment SA 2239 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.2239 Amendment SA 2239 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S2351; text: CR S2351) To make technical amendments to the bill. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2349-2354) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-214. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4869 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB5956 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-218.
HB5956 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-218.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Labor
Foreign labor
Immigration
Licensing and registrations
Northern Mariana Islands
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Wages and earnings
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Labor
Foreign labor
Immigration
Licensing and registrations
Northern Mariana Islands
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Wages and earnings