US HB4862 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 116-28-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit each applicant for naturalization to choose to have the oath of allegiance for naturalization administered by a Member of Congress, Delegate, or Resident Commissioner (Member). Limits the administration of the oath: (1) by a Senator to individuals who reside in the Senator's state; and (2) by a Member of the House of Representatives, Delegate, or Resident Commissioner to individuals who reside in the respective congressional district. Limits the Member's authority solely to the administration of such oath. Prohibits a Member from administering the oath during the 90-day period before any election for federal, state, or local office in which the Member is a candidate. Requires a Member to administer the oath only at times and places designated by the Secretary of Homeland Security. Prohibits a Member from administering the oath during any period in which exclusive authority to administer it may be exercised by an eligible court for the person concerned, unless the court has waived such exclusive authority.
Title
To permit Members of Congress to administer the oath of allegiance to applicants for naturalization, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-16 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-09-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6729-6730) | |
2010-09-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4862. | |
2010-09-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6729-6731) | |
2010-09-15 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-04-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law. | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |