US HB4846 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to provide for oversight of pharmacy benefit manager services.
Title
Better Deals and Lower Prices Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2679 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4822 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-231, Part I.
HB4822 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-231, Part I.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4846/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4846/BILLS-118hr4846ih.pdf |