US HB2679 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act, and the Internal Revenue Code of 1984 to increase oversight of pharmacy benefits manager services, and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Manager Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3561 (Related) 2023-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
HB4822 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-231, Part I.
HB4846 (Related) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4822 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-231, Part I.
HB4846 (Related) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2679/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2679/BILLS-118hr2679ih.pdf |