US HB4830 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SIT-REP Act Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to require educational institutions, in order to be eligible for educational payments, to adopt policies that prohibit penalizing student veterans for late VA assistance payments. Such policies shall: (1) permit a veteran who provides the institution with a certificate of VA assistance eligibility to attend courses for a period without VA payment; and (2) ensure that the educational institution will not impose penalties such as late fees, course denial, or requiring an individual to borrow additional funds because of delayed VA payments.
Title
SIT-REP Act Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 207 (Y: 382 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 207). (text: CR H4254-4255) |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4267) |
2018-05-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4830. |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4254-4256) |
2018-05-21 | House | Mr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537. |
2018-05-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-694. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3130 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Higher education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation