US HB4790 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal securities laws with respect to the materiality of disclosure requirements, to establish the Public Company Advisory Committee, and for other purposes.
Title
Guiding Uniform and Responsible Disclosure Requirements and Information Limits Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 275. |
2023-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-336. |
2023-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 21. |
2023-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4628 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4652 (Related) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4653 (Related) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4625 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB4652 (Related) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4653 (Related) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4625 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.