US HB4740 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1151)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1151)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs for Urban Sustainability in America Act - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to make additional grants from unobligated Troubled Asset Relief Program (TARP) funds under the Emergency Economic Stabilization Act of 2008 (EESA) to: (1) cities with high unemployment (with a population of at least 600,000 and an unemployment rate of 10% or more) for public works, training, and economic development projects; and (2) firms adversely affected by import competition which are assisted under the Trade Adjustment Assistance for Firms Program. Directs the Secretary of Labor to make grants from such funds to carry out adult and dislocated worker employment and training activities under the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 in cities with high unemployment.
Title
Jobs for Urban Sustainability in America Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-03 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1151) | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness. | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House Financial Services | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Trade adjustment assistance
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Trade adjustment assistance
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4740/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4740/BILLS-111hr4740ih.pdf |