US HB4731 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 816.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 816.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the retained use estate for the Caneel Bay resort in St. John, United States Virgin Islands, and for other purposes.
Title
To extend the retained use estate for the Caneel Bay resort in St. John, United States Virgin Islands, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 816. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1049. |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-21 | House | Introduced in House |