US HB4725 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community Bank Reporting Relief Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require federal banking agencies to issue regulations allowing certain small depository institutions to satisfy reporting requirements with a reduced Report of Condition and Income (i.e., call report).
Title
Community Bank Reporting Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1393) |
2018-03-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4725. |
2018-03-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1393-1395) |
2018-03-06 | House | Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437. |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-577. |
2018-01-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 55 - 0. |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-09 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-12-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.