US HB472 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Cost Reduction Act of 2013 - Requires: (1) the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to issue recommendations for reducing or consolidating the number of federal data centers by at least 40% by the end of FY2018 and by at least 80% by the end of FY2023, and (2) executive agency heads to implement such recommendations within six months after their issuance. Requires the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to report on: (1) recommendations to reduce long-term real estate costs and energy expenditures; and (2) federal employee parking expenses, with a plan to reduce such expenses. Requires executive agency heads to establish a plan to reduce the volume of material printed for FY2014-FY2024 and to require duplex printing on all federal printers and copiers. Requires the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to submit a plan to implement federal employee cost savings proposals. Authorizes executive agency heads to enter into cost-effective power purchase agreements for the purchase of electricity from federally-owned or controlled renewable energy sources. Establishes in the Treasury the Federal Facility Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy Projects Fund to provide assistance for energy efficiency and renewable energy projects carried out at federal facilities to reduce energy use. Requires the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to: (1) establish a federal facility energy efficiency and renewable energy projects fund program to make loans to assist agencies in reducing energy use; (2) promulgate regulations to enable agencies to retain the financial savings from entering into utility energy saving contracts; (3) promulgate regulations to enable agencies to identify all potential locations for renewable energy projects; (4) issue guidance for agencies to achieve energy savings by using computer hardware, energy efficiency software, and power management tools; and (5) issue guidance on a federal energy management and data collection standard that includes a plan for GSA to publish energy consumption data for individual facilities on a searchable and free website accessible by the public. Requires federal agencies to submit a plan to the Secretary on metering their consumption of electricity. Requires the Secretary to develop and report on best practices for the use of advanced metering of energy use in federal facilities, buildings, and equipment. Authorizes the GSA Administrator to use appropriated funds to update project designs to meet federal building energy efficiency standards. Requires the Administrator and the Secretary to incorporate commissioning and recommissioning standards for all real property that: (1) is more than $10 million in value, (2) has more than 50,000 square feet, or (3) has energy intensity of more than $2 per square foot. Requires that a contribution by the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to a state for facilities for reserve components of the Armed Forces, which is made at an armory or readiness center for an energy efficiency upgrade, cover 100% of the costs of architectural, engineering, and design services and the cost of the construction related to the upgrade.
Title
Federal Cost Reduction Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Military facilities and property
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Military facilities and property
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/472/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr472/BILLS-113hr472ih.pdf |