US HB4675 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2017 Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Energy to carry out a research program on low-dose radiation to enhance the scientific understanding of the effects of exposure and to improve risk-assessment and risk-management methods. "Low-dose radiation" is defined as a dose less than 100 millisieverts. (The Nuclear Regulatory Commission limits an adult's annual occupational radiation dose to 50 millisieverts.)
Title
Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2017 Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1090) |
2018-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4675. |
2018-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1090-1092) |
2018-02-13 | House | Mr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416. |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-554. |
2018-01-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cell biology and embryology
Energy research
Health
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Radiation
Research administration and funding
Energy research
Health
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Radiation
Research administration and funding