US HB4672 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Next Generation 9-1-1 Act of 2017
Title
Next Generation 9-1-1 Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2061 (Same As) 2017-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4672/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4672/BILLS-115hr4672ih.pdf |