US HB4627 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Shielding Public Spaces from Vehicular Terrorism Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to include among the responsibilities of the Under Secretary for Science and Technology of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) research and development to combat emerging terrorist threats, including vehicular attacks. The bill also includes demonstrated expertise in combating emerging terrorist threats, including vehicular attacks, among the criteria for the designation of colleges or universities as centers for homeland security. (Sec. 3) The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall permit the recipient of a grant under the Urban Area Security Initiative or under the State Homeland Security Grant Program to use grant funds to address security vulnerabilities of public spaces, including through the installation of bollards and other target hardening activities. The bill prohibits the use of such grants for the provision to any person of a firearm or training in the use of a firearm. (Sec. 4) DHS shall submit to the congressional homeland security committees a report on potential terrorism vulnerabilities relating to emerging automotive technologies that support driverless vehicles and the threat such vehicles may pose to people in public spaces. Such report shall also compare any public benefit of such vehicles against any vulnerabilities and threats.
Title
Shielding Public Spaces from Vehicular Terrorism Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-06-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5269-5270) |
2018-06-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4627. |
2018-06-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5269-5271) |
2018-06-19 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 590. |
2018-06-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-757. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged. |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2017-12-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Homeland security
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor vehicles
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Homeland security
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor vehicles
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security