US HB4596 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To reauthorize the Bureau of Reclamation to provide cost-shared funding to implement the endangered and threatened fish recovery programs for the Upper Colorado and San Juan River Basins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upper Colorado and San Juan River Basins Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Reauthorization Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-20HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2023-09-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-09-20HouseSubcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged
2023-07-27HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2023-07-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
2023-07-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-07-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3918 (Related) 2023-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
HB4629 (Related) 2023-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
SB2247 (Related) 2024-04-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 358.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback