US HB4555 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DHS Interagency Counterterrorism Task Force Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to assign DHS personnel to participate in overseas interagency counterterrorism task forces to: (1) facilitate the sharing of counterterrorism information; and (2) combat the threat of terrorism and associated risks to the United States stemming from overseas sources of conflict or terrorism, as determined by DHS. (Sec. 3) DHS shall report, by 18 months after this bill's enactment and annually thereafter for 3 years, on activities carried out pursuant to this bill.
Title
DHS Interagency Counterterrorism Task Force Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H46) |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4555. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H46-47) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-499. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |