US HB4550 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides FY2022 appropriations to the Department of Transportation (DOT), the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), and several related agencies. The bill provides appropriations to DOT for the Office of the Secretary, the Federal Aviation Administration, the Federal Highway Administration, the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, the Federal Railroad Administration, the Federal Transit Administration, the Great Lakes St. Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation, the Maritime Administration, the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration, and the Office of Inspector General. The bill provides appropriations to HUD for Management and Administration, Public and Indian Housing, Community Planning and Development, Housing Programs, the Federal Housing Administration, the Government National Mortgage Association (Ginnie Mae), Policy Development and Research, Fair Housing and Equal Opportunity, the Office of Lead Hazard Control and Healthy Homes, the Information Technology Fund, and the Office of Inspector General. The bill also provides appropriations to several related agencies, including the Access Board, the Federal Maritime Commission, the National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak) Office of Inspector General, the National Transportation Safety Board, the Neighborhood Reinvestment Corporation, the Surface Transportation Board, and the U.S. Interagency Council on Homelessness. Additionally, the bill sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation, Housing and Urban Development, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2022

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
2021-07-20HouseThe House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-99, by Mr. Price (NC).

Same As/Similar To

HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.
SB3045 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.

Subjects

Access Board
Accidents
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Transportation
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Maritime Commission
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Housing finance and home ownership
Interagency Council on Homelessness
Low- and moderate-income housing
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor carriers
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
National Transportation Safety Board (NTSB)
Neighborhood Reinvestment Corporation
Pipelines
Public housing
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Saint Lawrence Seaway
Surface Transportation Board
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback