US HB454 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect children against sexual abuse and exploitation, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Child Sex Abuse Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB724 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Held at the desk.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/454/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr454/BILLS-118hr454ih.pdf |