US HB4505 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Rule H. Res. 567 passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Rule H. Res. 567 passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the Departments of Commerce and Justice, Science, and Related Agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Science Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Justice Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Commerce Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | House | Rule H. Res. 567 passed House. |
2021-07-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 567 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4346, H.R. 4373 and H.R. 4505. Provides for consideration of H.R. 4346, H.R. 4373, and H.R. 4505 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate for each bill. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 70. |
2021-07-19 | House | The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-97, by Mr. Cartwright. |
2021-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR567 (Related) 2021-07-28 - On motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 201 - 192 (Roll no. 234).
SB3042 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7156-7158)
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
SB3042 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7156-7158)
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4505/BILLS-117hr4505rh.pdf |