US HB4503 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Empowering Victims of Sexual Misconduct Act
Title
Empowering Victims of Sexual Misconduct Act
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4540 (Related) 2017-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4690 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4615 (Related) 2017-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4484 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4494 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4522 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4690 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4615 (Related) 2017-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4484 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4494 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4522 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Members of Congress
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Worker safety and health
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Members of Congress
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4503/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4503/BILLS-115hr4503ih.pdf |