US HB4494 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 78-26)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Congressional Accountability and Hush Fund Elimination Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional Accountability and Hush Fund Elimination Act

Sponsors

Rep. Ron DeSantis [R]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]Rep. John Delaney [D]Rep. Dave Brat [R]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. David Loebsack [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Roger Williams [R]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]Rep. Luke Messer [R]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D]Rep. Jim Cooper [D]Rep. Andy Biggs [R]Rep. Don Bacon [R]
Rep. Jack Bergman [R]Rep. Francis Rooney [R]Rep. Jody Hice [R]Rep. David Scott [D]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D]
Rep. Martha McSally [R]Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Jim Banks [R]Rep. Ted Yoho [R]
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Diane Black [R]Rep. Todd Rokita [R]
Rep. Marsha Blackburn [R]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Ralph Norman [R]Rep. Tom Marino [R]
Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R]Rep. Bill Posey [R]Rep. Jim Costa [D]
Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]Rep. Mimi Walters [R]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]
Rep. Rod Blum [R]Rep. Keith Rothfus [R]Rep. Tim Ryan [D]Rep. Mark Walker [R]
Rep. Ken Buck [R]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]Rep. Mark Sanford [R]
Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Robert Latta [R]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]
Rep. David Schweikert [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R]Rep. Raul Labrador [R]
Rep. Jason Smith [R]Rep. Bill Johnson [R]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]
Rep. Mark Meadows [R]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]Rep. Ted Budd [R]Rep. Greg Walden [R]
Rep. Lou Barletta [R]Rep. Marc Veasey [D]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R]Rep. Edward Royce [R]
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]Rep. Mike Bost [R]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Mo Brooks [R]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]Rep. Michael Conaway [R]
Rep. Darrell Issa [R]Rep. Dennis Ross [R]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R]Rep. Scott Taylor [R]Rep. Mike Bishop [R]Rep. David Young [R]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Tom McClintock [R]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2017-11-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4481 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4540 (Related) 2017-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4484 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4503 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4522 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback