US HB4497 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E800-801)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To facilitate the development of affordable housing, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing is Infrastructure Act of 2021 Housing is Infrastructure Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E800-801)
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-07-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB659 (Related) 2021-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB816 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4495 (Related) 2021-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback