US SB2920 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide downpayment assistance to first-generation homebuyers to address multigenerational inequities in access to homeownership and to narrow and ultimately close the racial homeownership gap in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Downpayment Toward Equity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4495 (Same As) 2022-06-22 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
HB4497 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4497 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2920/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2920/BILLS-117s2920is.pdf |