US HB4467 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Under Secretary for Management of the Department of Homeland Security to assess contracts for covered services performed by contractor personnel along the United States land border with Mexico, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Border Services Contracts Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4467. |
2024-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-03-05 | House | Mr. Green (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-10-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190. |
2023-10-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-238. |
2023-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2023-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |