US HB4460 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth Sports Concussion Act This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) and the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) should review the National Academies' report on sports-related concussions and future research in such area for any matter that may impact products under the CPSC's jurisdiction or inform the FTC's efforts to protect consumers. The bill makes it unlawful to sell or offer for sale in interstate commerce, or import into the United States for such purposes, athletic sporting equipment for which the seller or importer makes any deceptive claim with respect to the safety benefits of such item. Violations shall be treated as unfair or deceptive acts or practices under the Federal Trade Commission Act. The bill sets forth the enforcement authority of the FTC. States may bring civil actions in federal court to obtain injunctive relief on behalf of state residents unless a civil or administrative action has already been instituted by the FTC. The FTC may intervene and appeal in state actions.
Title
Youth Sports Concussion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2413 (Related) 2015-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2508 (Same As) 2016-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 701.
SB2508 (Same As) 2016-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 701.
Subjects
Athletes
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4460/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4460/BILLS-114hr4460ih.pdf |