US HB4458 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a grant program within the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to award grants to eligible entities for the purpose of carrying out projects on the conservation, restoration, or management of kelp forest ecosystems.
Title
KELP Act Keeping Ecosystems Living and Productive Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-574. |
2022-02-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 19. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |