US HB4458 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Reserve Board, the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, and the National Credit Union Administration to each annually report on efforts to strengthen cybersecurity measures with respect to its regulatory functions.
Title
Cybersecurity and Financial System Resilience Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H195-196) |
2020-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4458. |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H195-198) |
2020-01-13 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector