US HB4404 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop and conduct an exercise related to the terrorist and foreign fighter threat in order to enhance domestic preparedness for and the collective response to terrorism, promote the dissemination of homeland security information, and test the U.S. security posture. Such exercise shall include: (1) a scenario involving persons traveling from the United States to join or provide material support or resources to a terrorist organization abroad and terrorist infiltration into the United States, including by U.S. citizens and foreign nationals; and (2) coordination with appropriate federal agencies, foreign governments, and state, local, tribal, territorial, and private sector stakeholders. DHS shall submit an after-action report, including any identified or potential vulnerabilities in U.S. defenses and requested legislative changes. (Sec. 3) The bill amends the Post-Katrina Emergency Management Reform Act of 2006 to require the national exercise program (a program to test and evaluate the national preparedness goal, National Incident Management System, National Response Plan, and other related plans and strategies) to be designed to include exercises addressing emerging terrorist threats, such as such a scenario.
Title
Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4597-4598) |
2016-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4404. |
2016-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4597-4600) |
2016-07-11 | House | Ms. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 350. |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-456. |
2016-02-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Homeland security
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Homeland security
Terrorism
Travel and tourism