US HB4375 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to report on the effectiveness of all NSF research and education programs intended to broaden the participation of women and other historically underrepresented individuals in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics disciplines and careers. (Sec. 3) Each federal agency that expended at least $100 million on research and development in FY2017 shall annually submit to the NSF standardized record-level information on demographics, primary field, award type, review rating, budget request, funding outcome, and awarded budget for all applications for merit-reviewed research and development grants to institutions of higher education and federal laboratories. The first submission must include comparable record-level data for the five previous years. The NSF shall publish statistical summaries of the data in conjunction with the required biennial reports on the participation of men and women in scientific and engineering positions.
Title
STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 686 (Y: 376 N: 9 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-12-19 | House | UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent that the clerk be directed to make a change in the engrossment of H.R. 4375. |
2017-12-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 9 (Roll no. 686). (text: CR H10158-10159) |
2017-12-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10165) |
2017-12-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4375. |
2017-12-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10158-10160) |
2017-12-18 | House | Mrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 350. |
2017-12-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-471. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2653 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Women's education
Women's employment
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Women's education
Women's employment