US HB2653 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STEM Opportunities Act of 2017
Title
STEM Opportunities Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2017-05-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E735-736) |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1270 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4375 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4375 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Minority employment
National Science Foundation
Office of Science and Technology Policy
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education
Women's employment
Adoption and foster care
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Minority employment
National Science Foundation
Office of Science and Technology Policy
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2653/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2653/BILLS-115hr2653ih.pdf |