US HB4369 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the use of passenger facility charges at an airport previously associated with the airport at which the charges are collected. (Sec. 1) This bill permits the Department of Transportation to authorize the use of a passenger facility charge to finance an eligible airport-related project if: (1) the eligible agency seeking to impose the new charge controls an airport where a $2 passenger facility charge became effective on January 1, 2013; and (2) such airport and the airport at which the project will be carried out were under the control of the same eligible agency on October 1, 2015. Not more than $120 million in passenger facility charges so collected may be used to carry out such a project.
Title
To authorize the use of passenger facility charges at an airport previously associated with the airport at which the charges are collected.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2016-06-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3983) |
2016-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4369. |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3983-3985) |
2016-06-21 | House | Mrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees